Home > North Shore Bank of Commerce > History
North Shore Bank of Commerce, History
The following are major historical events for North Shore Bank of Commerce, including mergers and acquisitions.
1915-09-14 | Institution established: Original name:Bank of Commerce and Savings, Incorporated | |
1946-07-10 | Changed name to Bank of Commerce & Savings | |
1950-05-22 | Changed name to Northwestern Bank of Commerce | |
1983-12-30 | Changed name to North Shore Bank of Commerce | |
1983-12-31 | Acquired North Shore State Bank (10996) in DULUTH, MN | |
1990-12-30 | Acquired Airport State Bank of Duluth (18809) in DULUTH, MN |