NBKC Bank, History
The following are major historical events for NBKC Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1999-03-30 | Institution established: Original name:Horizon National Bank | |
2002-06-26 | Acquired Winterset State Bank (12211) in HARRISONVILLE, MO | |
2004-02-02 | Changed name to National Bank of Kansas City | |
2007-01-09 | Moved bank headquarters from LEAWOOD, KS to OVERLAND PARK, KS | |
2015-12-18 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2015-12-18 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2015-12-18 | Changed name to NBKC Bank |