NBH Bank, History
The following are major historical events for NBH Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
2010-12-10 | Institution established: Original name:Bank Midwest, National Association | |
2011-07-22 | Acquired Bank of Choice (2994) in GREELEY, CO as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2011-10-21 | Acquired Community Banks of Colorado (21132) in GREENWOOD VILLAGE, CO as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2011-11-07 | Acquired Hillcrest Bank, National Association (59015) in OVERLAND PARK, KS | |
2012-05-20 | Changed name to NBH Bank, National Association | |
2015-08-01 | Acquired Pine River Valley Bank (22497) in BAYFIELD, CO | |
2016-01-01 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2016-01-01 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2016-01-01 | Moved bank headquarters from KANSAS CITY, MO to GREENWOOD VILLAGE, CO | |
2016-01-01 | Changed name to NBH Bank | |
2018-01-01 | Acquired Peoples National Bank (22211) in COLORADO SPRINGS, CO | |
2018-01-01 | Acquired Peoples Bank (4751) in LAWRENCE, KS |