Home > NBC OKLAHOMA > History
NBC OKLAHOMA, History
The following are major historical events for NBC OKLAHOMA, including mergers and acquisitions.
1931-08-01 | Institution established: Original name:The National Bank of Commerce of Altus | |
1989-01-26 | Acquired Oakwood National Bank (24537) in ENID, OK | |
1992-03-20 | Acquired Chisholm Federal Savings Association (33385) in KINGFISHER, OK | |
1998-07-15 | Changed name to National Bank of Commerce | |
1998-07-15 | Reorganized. | |
1998-07-15 | Moved bank headquarters from ALTUS, OK to TULSA, OK | |
2001-06-28 | Changed name to NBanC | |
2001-06-28 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2001-06-28 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2008-07-31 | Acquired NBanC (24093) in OKLAHOMA CITY, OK | |
2008-07-31 | Changed name to NBC OKLAHOMA | |
2008-07-31 | Moved bank headquarters from TULSA, OK to OKLAHOMA CITY, OK |