Home > Mutual Savings Association > History
Mutual Savings Association, History
The following are major historical events for Mutual Savings Association, including mergers and acquisitions.
1888-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Mutual Savings and Loan Association | |
1988-04-30 | Changed name to Mutual Savings Association | |
1993-03-10 | Changed name to Mutual Savings Association, FSA | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2018-12-28 | Changed institution class to INSURED SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATIONS | |
2018-12-28 | Changed name to Mutual Savings Association | |
2018-12-28 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION |