Home > Morris Bank > History
Morris Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Morris Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1954-11-29 | Institution established: Original name:The Morris State Bank | |
1994-03-31 | Reorganized. | |
2008-03-03 | Changed name to Morris Bank | |
2010-10-22 | Acquired The Gordon Bank (33904) in GORDON, GA as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2019-05-01 | Acquired Farmers & Merchants Bank (16673) in STATESBORO, GA |