Home > Morgan Stanley Private Bank > History
Morgan Stanley Private Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Morgan Stanley Private Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1996-08-12 | Acquired Union Federal Bank, A federal savings bank (29236) in LOS ANGELES, CA as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
1996-08-12 | Institution established: Original name:Dean Witter Trust FSB | |
1996-08-12 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
1998-03-24 | Changed name to Morgan Stanley Dean Witter Trust FSB | |
2001-12-10 | Changed name to Morgan Stanley Trust | |
2010-07-01 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2010-07-01 | Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK | |
2010-07-01 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANK, NATIONAL, MEMBER FRS | |
2010-07-01 | Moved bank headquarters from JERSEY CITY, NJ to PURCHASE, NY | |
2010-07-01 | Changed name to Morgan Stanley Private Bank, National Association | |
2011-06-01 | Reorganized. | |
2011-07-15 | Acquired Morgan Stanley Trust National Association (57628) in WILMINGTON, DE |