Home > Montecito Bank & Trust > History
Montecito Bank & Trust, History
The following are major historical events for Montecito Bank & Trust, including mergers and acquisitions.
1975-03-17 | Institution established: Original name:The Bank of Montecito | |
1978-01-27 | Moved bank headquarters from MONTECITO, CA to SANTA BARBARA, CA | |
1995-11-28 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
1996-02-01 | Changed name to Montecito Bank & Trust | |
2001-10-01 | Acquired Valley Oaks National Bank (33557) in SOLVANG, CA |