Home > Minnwest Bank > History
Minnwest Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Minnwest Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1941-05-19 | Institution established: Original name:Belview State Bank | |
1997-02-07 | Acquired Minnesota Valley Bank (9342) in REDWOOD FALLS, MN | |
1997-02-07 | Changed name to Minnesota Valley Bank | |
1997-02-07 | Moved bank headquarters from BELVIEW, MN to REDWOOD FALLS, MN | |
2002-05-01 | Changed name to Minnwest Bank, M.V. | |
2014-05-24 | Changed name to Minnwest Bank | |
2014-05-24 | Acquired Minnwest Bank Central (1398) in MONTEVIDEO, MN | |
2014-05-24 | Acquired Minnwest Bank Sioux Falls (35545) in SIOUX FALLS, SD | |
2014-05-24 | Acquired Minnwest Bank Metro (17898) in EAGAN, MN | |
2014-05-24 | Acquired Minnwest Bank Luverne (8224) in LUVERNE, MN | |
2014-05-24 | Acquired Minnwest Bank South (1410) in TRACY, MN | |
2014-07-26 | Acquired State Bank of Gibbon (11972) in GIBBON, MN | |
2018-09-21 | Acquired Security State Bank of Lewiston (10201) in LEWISTON, MN | |
2018-11-16 | Acquired First State Bank (15787) in WILMOT, SD | |
2018-11-16 | Acquired Peoples State Bank (9950) in SUMMIT, SD | |
2021-11-19 | Acquired RoundbankMinnwest Bank (5271) in WASECA, MN. |