Home > MidWestOne Bank > History
MidWestOne Bank, History
The following are major historical events for MidWestOne Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1934-10-15 | Institution established: Original name:Iowa State Bank and Trust Company | |
1974-01-10 | Changed name to Iowa State Bank & Trust Company | |
2008-08-09 | Acquired MidWestOne Bank (14197) in OSKALOOSA, IA | |
2008-08-09 | Changed name to MidWestOneBank | |
2008-08-09 | Acquired The First State Bank (14771) in CONRAD, IA | |
2008-09-03 | Changed name to MidWestOne Bank | |
2016-04-01 | Acquired Central Bank (27234) in GOLDEN VALLEY, MN | |
2019-05-01 | Acquired American Bank & Trust Wisconsin (6183) in CUBA CITY, WI | |
2019-05-01 | Acquired American Trust & Savings Bank (13150) in DUBUQUE, IA | |
2022-06-09 | Acquired First National Bank of MuscatineMidWestOne Bank (961) in MUSCATINE, IA. | |
2022-06-09 | Acquired First National Bank in FairfieldMidWestOne Bank (13853) in FAIRFIELD, IA. | |
2024-01-31 | Acquired The Bank of DenverMidWestOne Bank (17244) in DENVER, CO. |