Home > Midwest BankCentre > History
Midwest BankCentre, History
The following are major historical events for Midwest BankCentre, including mergers and acquisitions.
1906-03-01 | Institution established: Original name:Lemay Ferry Bank | |
1985-04-30 | Changed name to Lemay Bank & Trust Company | |
2000-01-03 | Changed name to Midwest BankCentre | |
2008-03-21 | Acquired The First National Bank of Mt. Pulaski (3715) in MOUNT PULASKI, IL | |
2015-04-25 | Acquired Southern Commercial Bank (1080) in SAINT LOUIS, MO | |
2016-07-16 | Acquired Bremen Bank and Trust Company (1067) in HAZELWOOD, MO |