Home > Mid-Missouri Bank > History
Mid-Missouri Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Mid-Missouri Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1872-06-20 | Institution established: Original name:Polk County Bank | |
2001-07-16 | Changed name to Mid-Missouri Bank | |
2001-07-16 | Acquired Laclede County Bank (9370) in LEBANON, MO | |
2001-07-16 | Moved bank headquarters from BOLIVAR, MO to SPRINGFIELD, MO | |
2001-08-13 | Acquired Tri-County State Bank of Eldorado Springs (14487) in EL DORADO SPRINGS, MO | |
2006-08-04 | Acquired The First National Bank of Mount Vernon (4555) in MOUNT VERNON, MO | |
2006-08-04 | Acquired Webb City Bank (12224) in WEBB CITY, MO | |
2021-06-01 | Moved bank headquarters from 1615 E Independence St, Springfield, MO to 1615 E Independence St, Springfield, MO. |