Home > Merchants Bank > History
Merchants Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Merchants Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1875-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Merchants National Bank of Winona | |
2001-09-01 | Changed name to Merchants Bank, National Association | |
2007-09-20 | Acquired The First National Bank in Cannon Falls (5108) in CANNON FALLS, MN | |
2007-09-20 | Acquired Merchants Bank, National Association (1919) in HAMPTON, MN | |
2009-06-28 | Acquired Merchants Bank, National Association (57493) in LA CRESCENT, MN | |
2009-06-28 | Acquired MERCHANTS BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (10953) in CALEDONIA, MN | |
2020-05-14 | Acquired The First National Bank of Northfield (5218) in NORTHFIELD, MN |