Home > Mercantile Bank > History
Mercantile Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Mercantile Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1997-12-15 | Institution established: Original name:Mercantile Bank of West Michigan | |
2005-08-01 | Changed name to Mercantile Bank of Michigan | |
2013-01-01 | Reorganized. | |
2014-06-30 | Acquired Keystone Community Bank (34387) in KALAMAZOO, MI | |
2014-06-30 | Acquired Firstbank (1597) in MT. PLEASANT, MI | |
2022-03-01 | Changed name to Mercantile Bank. |