Home > Mechanics Bank > History
Mechanics Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Mechanics Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1905-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:The Mechanics Bank of Richmond | |
1997-02-25 | Changed name to The Mechanics Bank | |
2011-03-24 | Changed name to Mechanics Bank | |
2016-01-01 | Moved bank headquarters from RICHMOND, CA to WALNUT CREEK, CA | |
2016-10-01 | Acquired California Republic Bank (58663) in IRVINE, CA | |
2018-06-01 | Acquired Scott Valley Bank (10781) in YREKA, CA | |
2019-08-31 | Acquired Rabobank, National Association (23364) in ROSEVILLE, CA |