Home > McClain Bank > History

McClain Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for McClain Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1922-03-08Institution established: Original name:The McLain County National Bank of Purcell
1935-09-19Changed name to The McClain County National Bank of Purcell
1990-07-26Acquired First National Bank (25605) in PURCELL, OK
1990-12-13Acquired First State Bank (9469) in LEXINGTON, OK
2001-01-23Changed name to McClain Bank National Associationl
2004-12-21Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS
2004-12-21Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
2004-12-21Changed name to McClain Bank