Home > MassMutual Private Wealth & Trust, FSB > History
MassMutual Private Wealth & Trust, FSB, History
The following are major historical events for MassMutual Private Wealth & Trust, FSB, including mergers and acquisitions.
2000-01-12 | Institution established: Original name:The MassMutual Trust Company, F.S.B. | |
2005-06-03 | Moved bank headquarters from HARTFORD, CT to ENFIELD, CT | |
2009-07-30 | Changed name to The MassMutual Trust Company | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2024-10-15 | Changed name to MassMutual Private Wealth & Trust, FSB. |