Home > Martha's Vineyard Bank > History
Martha's Vineyard Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Martha's Vineyard Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1955-04-15 | Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Dukes County Savings Bank | |
1985-11-04 | Became FDIC insured. | |
1991-06-25 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
1995-09-22 | Change trust powers from LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2007-11-01 | Changed name to Martha's Vineyard Savings Bank | |
2007-11-01 | Acquired The Martha's Vineyard Co-operative Bank of Tisbury (26603) in VINEYARD HAVEN, MA | |
2015-06-03 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2015-06-03 | Changed primary regulatory agency from STATE to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2021-03-30 | Changed name to Martha's Vineyard Bank. |