Home > Luminate Bank > History
Luminate Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Luminate Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1937-03-01 | Institution established: Original name:Security State Bank of Claremont | |
1999-12-01 | Changed name to Alliance Bank of Blooming Prairie | |
1999-12-01 | Moved bank headquarters from CLAREMONT, MN to BLOOMING PRAIRIE, MN | |
2001-09-22 | Changed name to Equity Bank | |
2002-10-21 | Moved bank headquarters from BLOOMING PRAIRIE, MN to DODGE CENTER, MN | |
2008-07-10 | Moved bank headquarters from DODGE CENTER, MN to MINNETONKA, MN | |
2018-09-30 | Changed name to American Equity Bank | |
2022-04-14 | Changed name to Luminate Bank. | |
2024-04-29 | Moved bank headquarters from 5900 Green Oak Dr, MINNETONKA, MN to 2523 South Wayzata Boulevard, MINNEAPOLIS, MN. |