Home > Louisiana National Bank > History
Louisiana National Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Louisiana National Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1935-03-20 | Institution established: Original name:First National Bank in Arcadia | |
1986-07-01 | Reorganized. | |
1986-07-01 | Changed name to First National Bank, Bienville Parish | |
1986-12-31 | Acquired Citizens Bank & Trust Company (20492) in ARCADIA, LA | |
2000-01-04 | Changed name to First National Bank | |
2021-05-01 | Changed name to Louisiana National Bank. |