Home > Liberty Savings Bank, F.S.B. > History
Liberty Savings Bank, F.S.B., History
The following are major historical events for Liberty Savings Bank, F.S.B., including mergers and acquisitions.
1984-09-14 | Institution established: Original name:Liberty Savings Bank, F.S.B. | |
1984-09-30 | Acquired Liberty Savings Association (30053) in LYNCHBURG, OH | |
1991-10-01 | Moved bank headquarters from LYNCHBURG, OH to WILMINGTON, OH | |
1991-10-01 | Acquired South Side Savings Bank, FSB (32627) in LIMA, OH | |
1996-07-02 | Acquired Colorado Savings Bank, F.S.B. (33128) in DENVER, CO | |
1996-10-01 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2021-08-02 | Moved bank headquarters from 2251 Rombach Avenue, Wilmington, OH to 2251 Rombach Avenue, Wilmington, OH. |