Home > Liberty Bank, Inc. > History
Liberty Bank, Inc., History
The following are major historical events for Liberty Bank, Inc., including mergers and acquisitions.
1956-11-05 | Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: First Thrift and Loan | |
1986-10-20 | Became FDIC insured. | |
1986-10-20 | Changed organization type to INDUSTRIAL BANK | |
1988-06-30 | Changed name to Liberty Financial Corporation | |
1992-01-01 | Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK | |
1994-06-07 | Changed name to Liberty Bank, Inc. |