Home > Legence Bank > History
Legence Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Legence Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1906-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:First State Bank of Eldorado | |
2005-12-07 | Changed name to First State Bank | |
2008-08-01 | Changed name to Legence Bank | |
2021-10-15 | ||
2021-12-03 |