Home > Lakeland Bank > History
Lakeland Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Lakeland Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1969-05-19 | Institution established: Original name:Lakeland State Bank | |
1975-11-18 | Moved bank headquarters from WEST MILFORD TOWNSHIP, NJ to NEWFOUNDLAND, NJ | |
1997-09-01 | Changed name to Lakeland Bank | |
2000-01-28 | Acquired Metropolitan State Bank (27260) in MONTVILLE, NJ | |
2001-06-29 | Acquired The National Bank of Sussex County (6315) in BRANCHVILLE, NJ | |
2003-08-25 | Acquired Community State Bank (34366) in TEANECK TOWNSHIP, NJ | |
2005-11-04 | Acquired The Newton Trust Company (14940) in NEWTON, NJ | |
2013-06-01 | Acquired Somerset Hills Bank (34720) in BERNARDSVILLE, NJ | |
2016-01-08 | Acquired Pascack Community Bank (57215) in WALDWICK, NJ | |
2016-07-01 | Acquired Harmony Bank (58713) in JACKSON, NJ | |
2019-01-04 | Acquired Highlands State Bank (58048) in VERNON, NJ |