Home > Lake Ridge Bank > History
Lake Ridge Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Lake Ridge Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1908-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:State Bank of Cross Plains | |
2002-07-31 | Acquired Bank of Waunakee (10744) in WAUNAKEE, WI | |
2006-12-04 | Acquired Independent Bank (15134) in VERONA, WI | |
2010-05-08 | Acquired The Black Earth State Bank (12787) in BLACK EARTH, WI | |
2019-06-01 | Acquired Union Bank & Trust Company (15177) in EVANSVILLE, WI | |
2023-02-13 | Changed name to Lake Ridge Bank. | |
2023-02-13 | Acquired Monona BankState Bank of Cross Plains (33458) in MONONA, WI. |