Home > KS Bank, Inc. > History

KS Bank, Inc., History

The following are a list of major historical events for KS Bank, Inc., including mergers and acquisitions.

1924-01-01Institution established: Original name:Kenly Savings and Loan Association
1992-07-29Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK
1992-07-29Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
1992-07-29Changed name to Kenly Savings Bank, S.S.B.
1993-12-29Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK
1993-12-29Changed name to Kenly Savings Bank, Inc., S.S.B.
1998-12-18Changed name to KS Bank, Inc.
2003-11-18Moved bank headquarters from KENLY, NC to SMITHFIELD, NC
2003-11-18Reorganized.
2015-07-01Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED