Home > KeyBank > History

KeyBank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for KeyBank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1849-01-01Institution established: Original name:Society National Bank of Cleveland
1979-07-30Acquired Society Bank of Painesville (17567) in PAINESVILLE, OH
1980-03-22Changed name to Society National Bank
1980-03-22Acquired First National Bank of Clermont County (6529) in BETHEL, OH
1980-09-20Acquired The First National Bank of Harrison (6602) in HARRISON, OH
1982-09-20Acquired The Second National Bank of Ravenna (6681) in RAVENNA, OH
1986-02-17Acquired Centran Bank of Akron (18339) in AKRON, OH
1986-02-18Acquired Central National Bank of Cleveland (6556) in CLEVELAND, OH
1987-05-17Acquired Society Bank of Northwest Ohio (26604) in PORT CLINTON, OH
1987-05-18Acquired Society Bank of the Firelands (779) in VERMILION, OH
1989-09-08Acquired Society Bank of Eastern Ohio, National Association (6690) in CANTON, OH
1992-02-17Acquired Society Bank, National Association (6568) in DAYTON, OH
1992-07-13Acquired AmeriTrust Company National Association (746) in CLEVELAND, OH
1992-09-28Acquired AmeriTrust Development Bank (26650) in CLEVELAND, OH
1993-08-23Acquired Society Bank & Trust (777) in TOLEDO, OH
1994-09-16Acquired State Home Savings Bank, F.S.B. (27804) in BOWLING GREEN, OH
1996-06-17Changed name to KeyBank National Association
1996-06-17Acquired Keybank National Association (21735) in BRYAN, OH
1997-06-23Acquired Key Trust Company of Florida, National Association (27546) in NAPLES, FL
1997-06-30Acquired KeyBank National Association (1254) in SALT LAKE CITY, UT
1998-06-30Acquired Keybank National Association (34243) in BEDFORD, NH
1998-07-31Acquired KeyTrust Company National Association (33575) in CHEYENNE, WY
1999-08-16Reorganized.
2000-12-29Acquired Key Trust Company National Association (27177) in SEATTLE, WA
2000-12-29Acquired Key Trust Company of Ohio, National Association (33968) in CLEVELAND, OH
2000-12-29Acquired Key Trust Company of Indiana, National Association (33969) in INDIANAPOLIS, IN
2000-12-29Acquired Key Trust Company National Association (26596) in PORTLAND, ME
2000-12-29Acquired Key Trust Company National Association (90992) in ALBANY, NY
2003-01-17Acquired Union Bank & Trust (14708) in DENVER, CO
2003-11-20Reorganized.
2004-10-01Acquired Key Bank USA, National Association (34055) in CLEVELAND, OH
2004-11-12Acquired EverTrust Bank (27070) in EVERETT, WA
2005-08-01Acquired EverTrust Asset Management (57613) in SEATTLE, WA
2008-01-17Acquired Union State Bank (20119) in NANUET, NY
2014-09-30Acquired KeyTrust Company National Association (91385) in ANCHORAGE, AK
2016-10-08Acquired First Niagara Bank, National Association (16004) in BUFFALO, NY
2017-07-31Reorganized.