Home > JPMorgan Chase Bank > History
JPMorgan Chase Bank, History
The following are major historical events for JPMorgan Chase Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1824-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Chemical Bank & Trust Company | |
1954-10-18 | Changed name to Chemical Corn Exchange Bank | |
1959-08-08 | Changed name to Chemical Bank New York Trust Company | |
1969-02-17 | Changed name to Chemical Bank | |
1975-01-18 | Acquired Security National Bank (7113) in HEMPSTEAD, NY | |
1975-11-10 | Acquired Chemical Bank of Suffolk, National Association (17544) in SMITHTOWN, NY | |
1977-04-01 | Acquired Chemical Bank Hudson Valley, National Association (17430) in NYACK, NY | |
1978-10-01 | Acquired Chemical Bank of Rochester (9408) in HILTON, NY | |
1978-10-01 | Acquired Chemical Bank of Syracuse (21391) in SYRACUSE, NY | |
1978-10-01 | Acquired Chemical Bank - Eastern, National Association (7084) in GREENWICH, NY | |
1978-10-01 | Acquired Chemical Bank of Binghamton (21935) in BINGHAMTON, NY | |
1978-10-01 | Acquired Chemical Bank-Buffalo (21298) in BUFFALO, NY | |
1982-02-03 | Moved bank headquarters from NEW YORK, NY to NEW YORK CITY, NY | |
1991-07-19 | Acquired Ensign Federal Savings Bank (33159) in NEW YORK CITY, NY | |
1991-11-08 | Acquired Community National Bank and Trust Company of New York (19519) in NEW YORK CITY, NY | |
1992-03-07 | Acquired Chemical Bank Delaware (24024) in WILMINGTON, DE | |
1992-03-13 | Acquired Central Federal Savings Bank (33277) in MINEOLA, NY | |
1992-06-20 | Acquired Manufacturers Hanover Trust Company (641) in NEW YORK CITY, NY | |
1993-07-01 | Acquired Texas Commerce Banks (26825) in NEWARK, DE | |
1996-07-14 | Changed name to The Chase Manhattan Bank | |
1996-07-14 | Acquired The Chase Manhattan Bank (National Association) (624) in NEW YORK CITY, NY | |
1996-12-01 | Acquired The Chase Manhattan Bank, National Association (23686) in MORRISTOWN, NJ | |
1998-10-01 | Acquired Morgan Stanley Trust Company (27272) in NEW YORK CITY, NY | |
1999-03-05 | Acquired Texas Commerce Trust Company of New York (91273) in NEW YORK CITY, NY | |
2000-08-01 | Acquired Chase Bank of Texas, National Association (3263) in HOUSTON, TX | |
2001-08-01 | Acquired Chase Bank of Texas-San Angelo, National Association (5508) in SAN ANGELO, TX | |
2001-11-10 | Acquired Morgan Guaranty Trust Company of New York (637) in NEW YORK CITY, NY | |
2001-11-10 | Changed name to JPMorgan Chase Bank | |
2004-11-13 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANK, NATIONAL, MEMBER FRS | |
2004-11-13 | Changed name to JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association | |
2004-11-13 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2004-11-13 | Moved bank headquarters from NEW YORK CITY, NY to COLUMBUS, OH | |
2004-11-13 | Acquired Bank One, National Association (6559) in COLUMBUS, OH | |
2004-11-13 | Acquired Bank One, National Association (3618) in CHICAGO, IL | |
2006-10-20 | Acquired Bank One Trust Company, National Association (21377) in COLUMBUS, OH | |
2008-08-16 | Acquired J. P. Morgan Trust Company, National Association (34696) in LOS ANGELES, CA | |
2008-09-25 | Acquired Washington Mutual Bank FSB (33891) in PARK CITY, UT | |
2008-09-25 | Acquired Washington Mutual Bank (32633) in HENDERSON, NV as part of a government assisted transaction. | |
2011-05-01 | Reorganized. | |
2011-06-01 | Reorganized. | |
2011-10-01 | Reorganized. | |
2011-10-14 | Acquired Custodial Trust Company (25809) in JERSEY CITY, NJ | |
2015-08-31 | Acquired JPMorgan Bank and Trust Company, National Association (58729) in SAN FRANCISCO, CA | |
2019-05-18 | Acquired Chase Bank USA, National Association (23702) in WILMINGTON, DE |