Home > Johnson Bank > History
Johnson Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Johnson Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1970-11-12 | Institution established: Original name:Heritage Bank | |
1978-05-23 | Changed name to Heritage Bank and Trust | |
1984-12-31 | Acquired Heritage Bank - Racine (19675) in RACINE, WI | |
1984-12-31 | Acquired Heritage Bank-Mt. Pleasant (21607) in MOUNT PLEASANT TOWNSHIP, WI | |
1987-12-15 | Reorganized. | |
1990-07-16 | Acquired Heritage Bank of Kenosha (18459) in KENOSHA, WI | |
1990-11-19 | Acquired Heritage Bank of Mukwonago (22944) in MUKWONAGO, WI | |
1997-05-12 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
1998-05-30 | Acquired The Bank of Fort Atkinson (11597) in FORT ATKINSON, WI | |
1998-05-30 | Changed name to Johnson Bank | |
1998-10-24 | Acquired Johnson Bank, National Association (5299) in JANESVILLE, WI | |
2002-03-26 | Acquired Johnson Bank Hayward (21126) in HAYWARD, WI | |
2002-10-01 | Acquired Capital Bank (33857) in GREEN BAY, WI | |
2003-07-01 | Acquired Johnson Trust Company (33012) in RACINE, WI | |
2006-06-19 | Acquired Johnson Bank Arizona, National Association (26384) in PHOENIX, AZ |