Home > Jim Thorpe Neighborhood Bank > History
Jim Thorpe Neighborhood Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Jim Thorpe Neighborhood Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1902-08-25 | Institution established: Original name:The Mauch Chunk National Bank | |
1954-06-16 | Moved bank headquarters from MAUCH CHUNK, PA to JIM THORPE, PA | |
1954-07-01 | Changed name to The Jim Thorpe National Bank | |
1989-07-01 | Reorganized. | |
2008-12-31 | Acquired Nesquehoning Savings Bank (31280) in NESQUEHONING, PA | |
2013-12-31 | Changed name to Jim Thorpe Neighborhood Bank | |
2013-12-31 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2013-12-31 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS |