Ion Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Ion Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1870-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Naugatuck Savings Bank | |
1985-06-06 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2005-03-01 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
2009-08-08 | Acquired Castle Bank & Trust Company (35159) in MERIDEN, CT | |
2013-10-18 | Changed name to Ion Bank | |
2022-07-01 | Acquired Lincoln 1st BankIon Bank (28963) in LINCOLN PARK, NJ. |