Institution for Savings in Newburyport and Its Vicinity, History
The following are major historical events for Institution for Savings in Newburyport and Its Vicinity, including mergers and acquisitions.
1820-01-01 | Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Institution for Savings in Newburyport and Its Vicinity | |
1985-08-13 | Became FDIC insured. | |
2007-07-01 | Acquired Ipswich Co-operative Bank (26452) in IPSWICH, MA | |
2014-08-29 | Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED | |
2014-08-29 | Acquired The Rockport National Bank (2644) in ROCKPORT, MA | |
2014-12-31 | Change trust powers from FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED to TRUST POWERS TERMINATED | |
2023-01-01 | Changed Organization Type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK. | |
2023-01-01 | Reorganized. |