Independent Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for Independent Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1890-01-01Institution established: Original name:Mutual Savings and Loan Association
1985-06-30Changed name to Mutual Savings and Loan Association, FA
1986-01-31Acquired Peoples Savings and Loan Association of Battle Creek (28047) in BATTLE CREEK, MI
1990-05-01Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK
1990-05-01Changed name to Mutual Savings Bank, F.S.B.
1990-06-01Changed name to Mutual Savings Bank, F.S.B
1991-08-01Changed name to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK, F.S.B.
1999-09-15Changed from the Savings Association Insurance Fund to the Bank Insurance Fund.
1999-09-15Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
1999-09-15Changed name to Independent Bank MSB
1999-09-15Reorganized.
2001-09-14Changed name to Independent Bank
2001-09-14Acquired Independent Bank (8180) in IONIA, MI
2004-07-01Acquired First National Bank of Gaylord (22057) in GAYLORD, MI
2004-09-08Change trust powers from FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED to TRUST POWERS TERMINATED
2007-09-15Moved bank headquarters from BAY CITY, MI to IONIA, MI
2007-09-15Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS
2007-09-15Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD
2007-09-15Acquired Independent Bank East Michigan (12732) in TROY, MI
2007-09-15Acquired Independent Bank - South Michigan (13930) in EAST LANSING, MI
2007-09-15Acquired Independent Bank-West Michigan (22094) in GRAND RAPIDS, MI
2015-04-20Moved bank headquarters from IONIA, MI to GRAND RAPIDS, MI
2018-04-01Acquired Traverse City State Bank (35350) in TRAVERSE CITY, MI