Home > INB > History

INB, History

The following are a list of major historical events for INB, including mergers and acquisitions.

1905-01-01Institution established: Original name:The First National Bank of Fairmount
1999-06-21Changed name to Illinois National Bank
1999-08-31Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to FULL TRUST POWERS GRANTED
2000-06-01Moved bank headquarters from FAIRMOUNT, IL to SPRINGFIELD, IL
2000-06-01Reorganized.
2004-10-29Acquired Riverton Community Bank (19438) in RIVERTON, IL
2019-10-01Changed name to INB, National Association