Home > Horicon Bank > History

Horicon Bank, History

The following are major historical events for Horicon Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1896-09-07Institution established: Original name:Horicon State Bank
1985-11-04Acquired Commercial State Bank (11615) in IRON RIDGE, WI
1990-08-31Acquired Burnett State Bank (9040) in BURNETT, WI
2004-06-21Changed name to Horicon Bank
2018-04-17Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED
2019-10-11Acquired Markesan State Bank (1517) in MARKESAN, WI