Home > HomeTrust Bank > History
HomeTrust Bank, History
The following are major historical events for HomeTrust Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1926-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Clyde Savings and Loan Association | |
1990-04-04 | Changed name to Clyde Savings Bank | |
1992-07-01 | Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK | |
1992-07-01 | Changed name to Clyde Savings Bank, SSB | |
1996-06-11 | Changed name to The Hometown Bank | |
1996-10-01 | Acquired Tryon Federal Savings and Loan Association (29565) in TRYON, NC | |
1998-02-28 | Acquired Shelby Savings Bank (28573) in SHELBY, NC | |
2003-07-28 | Changed name to HomeTrust Bank | |
2005-03-31 | Acquired Home Savings Bank (28010) in EDEN, NC | |
2010-01-31 | Acquired INDUSTRIAL FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK (28440) in LEXINGTON, NC | |
2010-10-01 | Acquired Cherryville Federal Savings and Loan Association (31015) in CHERRYVILLE, NC | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2012-07-10 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
2012-07-10 | Moved bank headquarters from CLYDE, NC to ASHEVILLE, NC | |
2013-08-01 | Acquired BankGreenville (58157) in GREENVILLE, SC | |
2014-05-31 | Acquired Jefferson Federal Bank (34137) in MORRISTOWN, TN | |
2014-08-01 | Acquired Bank of Commerce (58134) in CHARLOTTE, NC | |
2014-08-25 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANK, NATIONAL, MEMBER FRS | |
2014-08-25 | Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK | |
2014-08-25 | Changed name to HomeTrust Bank, National Association | |
2015-12-31 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2015-12-31 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2015-12-31 | Changed name to HomeTrust Bank | |
2017-01-01 | Acquired TriSummit Bank (58467) in KINGSPORT, TN |