Home > HomeTown Bank > History

HomeTown Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for HomeTown Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1924-01-01Institution established: Original name:Redwood Falls Federal Savings and Loan Association
1995-07-07Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS & LOAN
1998-06-16Changed name to Hometown Bank
2000-05-10Changed name to HomeTown Bank
2011-07-21Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY
2018-12-11Changed institution class to INSURED SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATIONS
2018-12-11Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
2018-12-28Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS
2018-12-28Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK