Home > HomeStreet Bank > History

HomeStreet Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for HomeStreet Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1986-08-18Institution established: Original name:Continental Savings Bank
1988-04-06Change trust powers from TRUST POWERS NOT GRANTED to LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED
1997-01-01Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK
1997-01-01Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
2000-05-15Changed name to HomeStreet Bank
2013-07-10Change trust powers from LIMITED TRUST POWERS GRANTED to TRUST POWERS TERMINATED
2013-11-01Acquired Fortune Bank (58437) in SEATTLE, WA
2013-11-02Acquired Yakima National Bank (34402) in YAKIMA, WA
2015-03-01Acquired Simplicity Bank (35448) in COVINA, CA
2016-02-01Acquired Orange County Business Bank (57338) in IRVINE, CA
2016-02-29Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS
2016-02-29Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK