Home > Homestead Savings Bank > History
Homestead Savings Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Homestead Savings Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1889-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Homestead Savings and Loan Association | |
1985-02-28 | Changed name to Homestead Savings and Loan Association, A Federal Association | |
1991-01-02 | Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK | |
1991-01-02 | Changed name to Homestead Savings Bank, F.S.B. | |
1999-07-01 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
1999-07-01 | Changed name to Homestead Savings Bank | |
2008-11-01 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION | |
2008-11-01 | Changed institution class to OCC SUPERVISED SAVINGS BANKS | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY |