Home > Home Savings Bank of Wapakoneta > History
Home Savings Bank of Wapakoneta, History
The following are major historical events for Home Savings Bank of Wapakoneta, including mergers and acquisitions.
1941-11-24 | Institution established: Original name:Home Savings and Loan Association | |
1996-03-21 | Changed name to The Home Savings and Loan Association | |
1998-05-06 | Changed name to Home Savings Bank of Wapakoneta | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION | |
2018-01-01 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL BANKS, STATE, NOT MEMBERS OF THE FRS | |
2018-01-01 | Changed organization type to MUTUAL COMMERCIAL BANK |