Home > Home Bank SB > History
Home Bank SB, History
The following are major historical events for Home Bank SB, including mergers and acquisitions.
1890-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Home Building Association | |
1986-10-31 | Changed name to The Home Building Association | |
1990-01-01 | Changed name to Home Bank SB | |
2006-10-24 | Changed institution class to OCC SUPERVISED SAVINGS BANKS | |
2006-10-24 | Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY |