Home > Home Bank of California > History
Home Bank of California, History
The following are major historical events for Home Bank of California, including mergers and acquisitions.
1981-10-31 | Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: Home Thrift & Loan Association | |
1985-06-03 | Became FDIC insured. | |
1994-11-01 | Changed name to Home Investment and Loan | |
2000-04-03 | Changed name to Home Bank of California | |
2008-07-11 | Changed organization type to COMMERCIAL BANK |