Hills Bank and Trust Company, History

The following are a list of major historical events for Hills Bank and Trust Company, including mergers and acquisitions.

1904-01-01Institution established: Original name:Hills Savings Bank
1934-08-06Changed name to Hills Bank & Trust Company
1952-01-15Changed name to Hills Bank and Trust Company
1984-06-01Acquired uniBank & Trust (17925) in CORALVILLE, IA
2000-11-17Acquired Hills Bank (10119) in CEDAR RAPIDS, IA
2001-10-27Acquired Hills Bank Kalona (34361) in KALONA, IA