Home > Heritage Bank of Commerce > History
Heritage Bank of Commerce, History
The following are major historical events for Heritage Bank of Commerce, including mergers and acquisitions.
1994-06-08 | Institution established: Original name:Heritage Bank of Commerce | |
1998-02-17 | Reorganized. | |
2000-02-25 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2000-02-25 | Changed primary regulatory agency from FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2003-01-01 | Acquired Heritage Bank South Valley (35300) in MORGAN HILL, CA | |
2003-01-01 | Acquired Bank of Los Altos (22176) in LOS ALTOS, CA | |
2003-01-01 | Acquired Heritage Bank East Bay (34912) in FREMONT, CA | |
2007-06-21 | Acquired Diablo Valley Bank (57551) in DANVILLE, CA | |
2015-08-21 | Acquired Focus Business Bank (58474) in SAN JOSE, CA | |
2018-04-07 | Acquired Tri-Valley Bank (58004) in SAN RAMON, CA | |
2018-05-05 | Acquired United American Bank (57447) in SAN MATEO, CA | |
2019-10-11 | Acquired Presidio Bank (58325) in SAN FRANCISCO, CA |