Home > Heritage Bank > History

Heritage Bank, History

The following are major historical events for Heritage Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1964-10-08Institution established: Original name:Citizens National Bank of Willmar
1984-10-01Changed name to Heritage Bank National Association
1989-10-17Acquired The Citizens National Bank of Madelia (5188) in MADELIA, MN
1989-10-17Acquired State Bank of Pennock (9754) in PENNOCK, MN
2003-03-24Moved bank headquarters from WILLMAR, MN to SPICER, MN
2004-10-09Acquired Farmers' State Bank of Raymond (1608) in RAYMOND, MN
2011-07-01Acquired Heritage Bank, National Association (25243) in HOLSTEIN, IA