Hancock Whitney Bank, History

The following are a list of major historical events for Hancock Whitney Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.

1899-10-09Institution established: Original name:Hancock County Bank
1938-08-27Changed name to Hancock Bank
1973-12-01Acquired Bank of Commerce of Poplarville (11420) in POPLARVILLE, MS
1975-06-19Acquired Bank of Picayune (11427) in PICAYUNE, MS
1985-10-01Acquired Pascagoula-Moss Point Bank (15924) in MOSS POINT, MS
1990-06-04Acquired Metropolitan National Bank (19873) in BILOXI, MS
1991-08-09Acquired Peoples Federal Savings Association (33321) in BAY ST. LOUIS, MS
2001-09-24Acquired The Lamar Bank (11421) in PURVIS, MS
2009-12-18Acquired Peoples First Community Bank (32167) in PANAMA CITY, FL as part of a government assisted transaction.
2010-01-01Acquired Hancock Bank of Florida (57819) in TALLAHASSEE, FL
2014-03-31Changed name to Whitney Bank
2014-03-31Acquired Whitney Bank (33029) in NEW ORLEANS, LA
2017-04-28Acquired First NBC Bank (58302) in NEW ORLEANS, LA as part of a government assisted transaction.
2018-05-25Changed name to Hancock Whitney Bank
2018-07-13Reorganized.
2019-09-21Acquired MidSouth Bank, National Association (25884) in LAFAYETTE, LA