Home > Great Oaks Bank > History
Great Oaks Bank, History
The following are major historical events for Great Oaks Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1934-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Citizens Sterling Bank | |
1965-12-22 | Changed name to Citizens Bank & Trust Co. | |
1966-01-21 | Changed name to Citizens Bank & Trust Company | |
1987-02-02 | Acquired Williams Banking Company (16634) in RHINE, GA | |
2020-06-30 | Changed name to Great Oaks Bank |