Home > Golden Belt Bank, FSA > History
Golden Belt Bank, FSA, History
The following are major historical events for Golden Belt Bank, FSA, including mergers and acquisitions.
1920-01-01 | Institution established: Original name:Golden Belt Savings and Loan Association | |
1989-05-31 | Changed name to Golden Belt Building and Savingsa | |
1993-04-16 | Changed name to Golden Belt Bank, FSA | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2017-10-02 | Acquired Morgan Federal Bank (29439) in FORT MORGAN, CO | |
2020-06-17 | Moved bank headquarters from ELLIS, KS to Hays, KS |