GNB Bank, History
The following are major historical events for GNB Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1934-03-16 | Institution established: Original name:The Grundy National Bank of Grundy Center | |
1987-07-01 | Acquired Hawkeye Bank & Trust (13913) in GRUNDY CENTER, IA | |
2011-12-30 | Changed institution class to INSURED COMMERCIAL OR SAVINGS BANKS, STATE, MEMBERS FRS | |
2011-12-30 | Changed primary regulatory agency from COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY to FEDERAL RESERVE BOARD | |
2012-07-03 | Acquired First State Bank (16217) in MANCHESTER, IA | |
2016-01-01 | Acquired Ackley State Bank (14936) in ACKLEY, IA |