GN Bank, History
The following are major historical events for GN Bank, including mergers and acquisitions.
1976-09-30 | Acquired Service Federal Savings and Loan Association (30495) in CHICAGO, IL | |
1982-03-31 | Acquired Morgan Park Savings and Loan Association (30711) in CHICAGO, IL | |
2011-07-21 | Changed primary regulatory agency from OFFICE OF THRIFT SUPERVISION to COMPTROLLER OF THE CURRENCY | |
2014-06-25 | Changed organization type to MUTUAL SAVINGS BANK | |
2016-04-28 | Changed organization type to STOCK SAVINGS BANK | |
2018-05-31 | Changed name to GN Bank |